DC B25-0219 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-219 would provide statutory authority for the creation, revocation, and use of powers of appointment by codifying existing patchwork of court cases that constitute the common law on powers of appointment.
Title
Uniform Powers of Appointment Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-04-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0219 Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-03-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0219 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52710/Introduction/B25-0219-Introduction.pdf |