DC B25-0189 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - Law L25-0068, Effective from Nov 28, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015603
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - Law L25-0068, Effective from Nov 28, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015603
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-189 would provide procedures to fill a vacancy in the position of Executive Director.
Title
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Acting Executive Director Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-08 | Council | Law L25-0068, Effective from Nov 28, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015603 |
2023-10-20 | Council | Act A25-0251 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013833 |
2023-10-13 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-10-12 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-10-11 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0251 |
2023-09-27 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 12, 2023 |
2023-09-19 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-07-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-07-11 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-07-11 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0189 |
2023-03-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-03-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0189 Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |