DC B25-0154 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Law L25-0028, Effective from Jul 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010346
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Law L25-0028, Effective from Jul 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010346
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 25-154 would officially designate Swann Street N.W., between 14th Street N.W. and 19th Street N.W., in honor of William Dorsey Swann.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill was passed Subject to Appropriations. Please see Fiscal Impact Statement for more information. Bill was funded via Bill 25-205 "Fiscal Year 2023 Revised Local Budget Emergency Act of 2023."
Title
William Dorsey Swann Street Designation Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | Council | Law L25-0028, Effective from Jul 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010346 |
2023-06-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-06-02 | Council | Act A25-0103 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 007914 |
2023-05-25 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-05-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0103 |
2023-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-04-05 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-04-04 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-03-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0154 |
2023-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0154 Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |