DC B25-0028 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Law L25-0023, Effective from Jul 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010341
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Law L25-0023, Effective from Jul 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010341
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-28 would symbolically designate the portion of 10th Place, S.E. in Squares 5933, 5934, 5938, and 5939 between Mississippi Avenue, S.E. and Savannah Street, S.E. as “Cassandra S. Pinkney Way”.
Title
Cassandra S. Pinkney Way Designation Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | Council | Law L25-0023, Effective from Jul 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010341 |
2023-06-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-06-02 | Council | Act A25-0099 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 007906 |
2023-05-25 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-05-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0099 |
2023-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-04-13 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-04-04 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-04-04 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0028 |
2023-01-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0028 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |