DC B24-1108 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-03 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-03 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications Nos. 10, 11, 12 and 13 to Contract No. DCKA-2021-C-0014 with Conduent State and Local Solutions, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2022
Title
Modifications Nos. 10, 11, 12 and 13 to Contract No. DCKA-2021-C-0014 with Conduent State and Local Solutions, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-12-28 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0709, Expires on Mar 28, 2023 |
2022-12-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 4, 2023 |
2022-12-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-12-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-11-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |