DC B24-1089 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 3 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 18, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 3 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 18, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
FISCAL NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see Fiscal Impact Statement for more information.
Title
Howard University Property Tax Exemption Clarification Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-20 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-12-20 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 18, 2023 |
2022-12-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-12-20 | Council | Amendment (McDuffie) |
2022-12-06 | Council | First Reading |
2022-11-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-11-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-1089 |
2022-11-28 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-11-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-11-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-1089 Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2022-10-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |