DC B24-1063 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sports Wagering and Fair Competition Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Sports Wagering and Fair Competition Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-11-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-1063 Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2022-10-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-1063 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/51507/Introduction/B24-1063-Introduction.pdf |