DC B24-0992 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Migrant Services and Supports Act of 2022
Title
Migrant Services and Supports Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-09-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0992 Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Human Services |
2022-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0992 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/51261/Introduction/B24-0992-Introduction.pdf |