DC B24-0896 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - Law L24-0197, Effective from Dec 13, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 015298, Expires on Jul 26, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - Law L24-0197, Effective from Dec 13, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 015298, Expires on Jul 26, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Anti-SLAPP Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Anti-SLAPP Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Council | Law L24-0197, Effective from Dec 13, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 015298, Expires on Jul 26, 2023 |
2022-10-31 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-10-21 | Council | Act A24-0570 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012675 |
2022-10-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-10-17 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0570 |
2022-09-30 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 17, 2022 |
2022-09-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-09-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-07-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0896 Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-12 | Council | First Reading |
2022-07-12 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-07-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |