DC B24-0892 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-892 would symbolically designate the 700 Block of Quebec Place, N.W., in Ward 1, as Bishop Clarence Groover, Sr. Way.
Title
Bishop Groover Way Designation Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0892 Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-12 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0892 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/49918/Introduction/B24-0892-Introduction.pdf |