DC B24-0882 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on July 21 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-07 - Law L24-0185, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011955, Expires on May 04, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on July 21 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-07 - Law L24-0185, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011955, Expires on May 04, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Service Commission Member Qualifications Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Public Service Commission Member Qualifications Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-07 | Council | Law L24-0185, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011955, Expires on May 04, 2023 |
2022-08-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-08-05 | Council | Act A24-0531 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009936 |
2022-07-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-07-27 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0531 |
2022-07-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 4, 2022 |
2022-07-12 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-07-01 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0882 Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-28 | Council | First Reading |
2022-06-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |