DC B24-0862 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-29 - Act A24-0499 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009350, Expires on Oct 23, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-29 - Act A24-0499 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009350, Expires on Oct 23, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 1 and 2 to Contract No. DCAM-20-CS-RFQ-0001I with Bennett Group, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2022
Title
Modification Nos. 1 and 2 to Contract No. DCAM-20-CS-RFQ-0001I with Bennett Group, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-29 | Council | Act A24-0499 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009350, Expires on Oct 23, 2022 |
2022-07-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-07-25 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0499, Expires on Oct 23, 2022 |
2022-07-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 25, 2022 |
2022-06-28 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-06-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-06-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |