DC B24-0847 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Act A24-0554 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012629, Expires on Jan 15, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Act A24-0554 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012629, Expires on Jan 15, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 13 and 14 to Contract No. CW64063 with Health IT 2 Business Solutions, LLC dba CODICE Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2022
Title
Modification Nos. 13 and 14 to Contract No. CW64063 with Health IT 2 Business Solutions, LLC dba CODICE Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Council | Act A24-0554 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012629, Expires on Jan 15, 2023 |
2022-10-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-10-17 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0554, Expires on Jan 15, 2023 |
2022-09-30 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 17, 2022 |
2022-09-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-09-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-06-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-06-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |