DC B24-0781 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Act A24-0422 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 006231, Expires on Aug 21, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Act A24-0422 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 006231, Expires on Aug 21, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Coronavirus Support Remote Cooperative Association Meetings Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Coronavirus Support Remote Cooperative Association Meetings Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Council | Act A24-0422 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 006231, Expires on Aug 21, 2022 |
2022-05-24 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-05-23 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0422, Expires on Aug 21, 2022 |
2022-05-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-05-16 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 31, 2022 |
2022-05-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-05-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |