DC B24-0707 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-707 would clarify requirements for private collection properties to provide at least 32 gallons of solid waste container space per residential unit as well as collection services twice per week . It also adds a civil penalty or fine for repeat violations within a 6-month period.
Title
Containing Litter and Ensuring Adequate Neighborhood (CLEAN) Collections Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-09-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-04-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0707 Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-15 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2022-03-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0707 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/49005/Introduction/B24-0707-Introduction.pdf |