DC B24-0621 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 7 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-25 - Act A24-0325 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001440, Expires on Apr 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 7 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-25 - Act A24-0325 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001440, Expires on Apr 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan Police Department Overtime Spending Accountability Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2022
Title
Metropolitan Police Department Overtime Spending Accountability Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-25 | Council | Act A24-0325 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001440, Expires on Apr 24, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-02-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 22, 2022 |
2022-02-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-02-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-01-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
2022-01-24 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0325, Expires on Apr 24, 2022 |