DC B24-0599 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 10 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - Law L24-0107, Effective from Apr 08, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 003710, Expires on Nov 19, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 10 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - Law L24-0107, Effective from Apr 08, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 003710, Expires on Nov 19, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Attorney General Civil Rights Enforcement Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Attorney General Civil Rights Enforcement Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | Council | Law L24-0107, Effective from Apr 08, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 003710, Expires on Nov 19, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-02-25 | Council | Act A24-0339 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001478 |
2022-02-22 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-02-17 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0339 |
2022-02-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-01-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0599 Published in the DC Register |
2022-01-04 | Council | First Reading |
2022-01-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-01-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |