DC B24-0582 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-28 - Act A24-0302 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000620, Expires on Apr 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-28 - Act A24-0302 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000620, Expires on Apr 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding Student Access to Period Products Emergency Act of 2022
Title
Expanding Student Access to Period Products Emergency Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | Council | Act A24-0302 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000620, Expires on Apr 24, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-01-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0302, Expires on Apr 24, 2022 |
2022-01-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2022 |
2022-01-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-01-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-01-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |