DC B24-0544 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-21 - Not considered - Declaration Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-21 - Not considered - Declaration Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encampments Protection and Public Health and Safety Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Encampments Protection and Public Health and Safety Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Council | Not considered - Declaration Failed |
2021-12-07 | Council | Postponed to December 21, 2021 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-12-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0544 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/48371/Introduction/B24-0544-Introduction.pdf |