DC B24-0519 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-519 would require the designation of a social worker on staff at all living facilities in the District of Columbia to provide social services.
Title
Living Facility Compulsory Social Worker Designation Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-03-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-03-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-03-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-02-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-02-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-02-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0519 Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2021-11-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0519 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/48316/Introduction/B24-0519-Introduction.pdf |