DC B24-0516 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 24-516 would prohibit the practice of female genital mutilation and cutting (FGM/C) in the District, including prohibiting a parent, guardian, or conservator from removing a person under their care from the District for the purpose of facilitating FGM/C abroad.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Female Genital Mutilation Prohibition Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-28CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2022-02-04CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2022-01-31CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-12-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2021-12-03CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0516 Published in the DC Register
2021-11-19CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback