DC B24-0509 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-509 would establish the authority of the Office of the Inspector General to undertake reviews and investigations of the District of Columbia Housing Authority without a prior request of the Council.
Title
Inspector General Oversight Consistency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-11-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-11-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023 |
2022-12-16 | Council | Act A24-0685 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 015097 |
2022-12-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-12-08 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0685 |
2022-11-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 12, 2022 |
2022-11-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-11-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-10-24 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-10-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0509 |
2022-10-20 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-07-11 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-05-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-05-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0509 Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-16 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities |
2021-11-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |