DC B24-0479 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-26 - Act A24-0211 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012363, Expires on Feb 16, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-26 - Act A24-0211 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012363, Expires on Feb 16, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fifty-Point Preference Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Fifty-Point Preference Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-26 | Council | Act A24-0211 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012363, Expires on Feb 16, 2022 |
2021-11-19 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-11-18 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0211, Expires on Feb 16, 2022 |
2021-11-05 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 22, 2021 |
2021-11-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-11-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-11-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |