DC B24-0472 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 20 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-18 - Law L24-0076, Effective from Feb 24, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002020, Expires on Oct 07, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 20 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-18 - Law L24-0076, Effective from Feb 24, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002020, Expires on Oct 07, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Analyzing Additional Emergency Procurement Activity Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Analyzing Additional Emergency Procurement Activity Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Council | Law L24-0076, Effective from Feb 24, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002020, Expires on Oct 07, 2022 |
2022-01-14 | Council | Act A24-0275 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000211 |
2022-01-11 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-01-06 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0275 |
2022-01-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-12-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 5, 2022 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-11-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0472 Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-02 | Council | First Reading |
2021-11-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-11-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |