DC B24-0338 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-338 would update the definition of the word “child” in District law. It would modernize the definition so that allegations of law violations by individuals under 18 years of age will be subject to juvenile delinquency proceedings in Family Court unless a judge transfers the matter to adult court. Cases could still be moved to adult court if a judge determines that the child cannot be rehabilitated in the juvenile system.
Title
Redefinition of Child Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-08-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-08-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-07-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0338 Published in the DC Register |
2021-07-13 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-06-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0338 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/47602/Introduction/B24-0338-Introduction.pdf |