DC B24-0263 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-29 - Vetoed by the Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-29 - Vetoed by the Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fidelity in Compliance of Contracting and Procurement Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Fidelity in Compliance of Contracting and Procurement Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-29 | Council | Vetoed by the Mayor |
2021-07-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-07-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2021 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-06-29 | Council | Amendment (Allen) |
2021-06-01 | Council | Agendized; not considered at the request of McDuffie |
2021-06-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-05-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |