DC B24-0216 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-04 - Act A24-0092 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005858, Expires on Aug 24, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-04 - Act A24-0092 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005858, Expires on Aug 24, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Public Schools 2021-2022 Funding Stabilization Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
District of Columbia Public Schools 2021-2022 Funding Stabilization Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Amendment (Lewis George) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Amendment (Lewis George) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Amendment (Lewis George) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Amendment (Lewis George) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Council | Act A24-0092 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005858, Expires on Aug 24, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-05-26 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0092, Expires on Aug 24, 2021 |
2021-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-05-04 | Council | Amendment (Lewis George) |
2021-05-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-04-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |