DC B24-0185 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Independent 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-04 - Act A24-0090 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005853, Expires on Aug 24, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-04 - Act A24-0090 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005853, Expires on Aug 24, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Short-term Disability Insurance Benefit Protection Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Short-term Disability Insurance Benefit Protection Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Council | Act A24-0090 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005853, Expires on Aug 24, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-05-26 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0090, Expires on Aug 24, 2021 |
2021-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-05-04 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Silverman) |
2021-04-06 | Council | Postponed to 5/4/21 |
2021-04-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-04-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |