DC B24-0175 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Act A24-0070 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 004921, Expires on Aug 02, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Act A24-0070 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 004921, Expires on Aug 02, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 10, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 21 and 22 to Contract No. DCAM-19-CS-RFP-0075 with Lightbox/Bluefin Partners (Joint Venture) Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Title
Modification Nos. 10, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 21 and 22 to Contract No. DCAM-19-CS-RFP-0075 with Lightbox/Bluefin Partners (Joint Venture) Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Council | Act A24-0070 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 004921, Expires on Aug 02, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-05-04 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0070, Expires on Aug 02, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 4, 2021 |
2021-04-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-04-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-03-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |