DC B24-0168 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Law L24-0024, Effective from Aug 28, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010056
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Law L24-0024, Effective from Aug 28, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010056
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 24-24 removes certain limitations on the authority of the Mayor or the Mayor’s assignee to purchase housing accommodations under the District Opportunity to Purchase Act. It establishes affordable housing requirements applicable to housing accommodations purchased by the Mayor.
Title
District’s Opportunity to Purchase Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Council | Law L24-0024, Effective from Aug 28, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010056 |
2021-07-19 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-07-16 | Council | Act A24-0111 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 006932 |
2021-07-13 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-07-12 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0111 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 14, 2021 |
2021-06-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-01 | Council | First Reading |
2021-05-18 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-05-13 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0168 |
2021-05-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-05-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0168 Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Executive Administration |
2021-03-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |