DC B24-0164 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Act A24-0068 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 004911, Expires on Jul 13, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Act A24-0068 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 004911, Expires on Jul 13, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Non-Public Student Educational Continuity Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Non-Public Student Educational Continuity Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Council | Act A24-0068 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 004911, Expires on Jul 13, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-05-03 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0068, Expires on Jul 13, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 4, 2021 |
2021-04-06 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-04-06 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2021-04-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-04-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |