DC B24-0109 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-11 - Law L24-0190, Effective from Oct 22, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 013898
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-11 - Law L24-0190, Effective from Oct 22, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 013898
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-109 would prohibit marijuana testing as a condition of employment, except for certain positions or if otherwise required by law.
Title
Prohibition of Marijuana Testing Act of 2021 (now known as "Cannabis Employment Protections Amendment Act of 2022")
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-11 | Council | Law L24-0190, Effective from Oct 22, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 013898 |
2022-07-28 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-07-22 | Council | Act A24-0483 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008849 |
2022-07-19 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-07-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0483 |
2022-07-05 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 19, 2022 |
2022-06-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-05-03 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-05-03 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-04-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0109 |
2022-03-04 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-03-03 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0109 |
2022-03-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-03-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2021-05-28 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2021-05-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0109 Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2021-02-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |