DC B24-0096 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Law L24-0115, Effective from May 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 006199
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Law L24-0115, Effective from May 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 006199
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-96 would provide the Superior court of the District of Columbia with the ability to seal eviction records in certain circumstances. Specifically, the legislation would require that the Court seal eviction records where the Court did not find for the landlord or the landlord withdrew their claim. Among other things, it would require that the Court seal all other eviction records after three years and authorizes the Court to seal certain eviction records upon motion by the defendant.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations.
Title
Eviction Record Sealing Authority Amendment Act of 2021 (now known as "Eviction Record Sealing Authority and Fairness in Renting Amendment Act of 2022")
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson, Bonds and Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Oral Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Amendment (C. Allen) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson and A. Bonds) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Oral Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Amendment (C. Allen) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson and A. Bonds) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson, Bonds and Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Oral Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Amendment (C. Allen) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson and A. Bonds) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Oral Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Amendment (C. Allen) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson and A. Bonds) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Council | Law L24-0115, Effective from May 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 006199 |
2022-04-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-04-01 | Council | Act A24-0357 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002638 |
2022-03-28 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-03-28 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0357 |
2022-03-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 28, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-03-01 | Council | Amendment (Allen) |
2022-03-01 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson, Bonds and Cheh) |
2022-02-01 | Council | Postponed to March 1, 2022 |
2022-01-04 | Council | Oral Amendment (Mendelson) |
2022-01-04 | Council | Amendment (C. Allen) |
2022-01-04 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson and A. Bonds) |
2022-01-04 | Council | First Reading |
2021-12-02 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-12-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0096 |
2021-12-01 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-12-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-10-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-04-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0096 Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Executive Administration |
2021-02-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |