DC B24-0015 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-05 - Act A24-0001 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001525, Expires on Apr 14, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

January 2021 Public Emergency Extension Authorization Emergency Amendment Act of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

January 2021 Public Emergency Extension Authorization Emergency Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-15 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05CouncilAct A24-0001 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001525, Expires on Apr 14, 2021
2021-01-19CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-01-15CouncilReturned from Mayor
2021-01-15CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0001, Expires on Apr 14, 2021
2021-01-15CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 2, 2021
2021-01-15CouncilAmendment (Mendelson)
2021-01-15CouncilFinal Reading
2021-01-13CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback