DC B24-0005 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Law L24-0001, Effective from Apr 20, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 004800, Expires on Dec 01, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Law L24-0001, Effective from Apr 20, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 004800, Expires on Dec 01, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Non-Public Student Educational Continuity Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Non-Public Student Educational Continuity Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Council | Law L24-0001, Effective from Apr 20, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 004800, Expires on Dec 01, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | Council | Act A24-0027 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 002629 |
2021-03-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-03-04 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-02-26 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0027 |
2021-02-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-01-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0005 Published in the DC Register |
2021-01-05 | Council | First Reading |
2021-01-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-01-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |