DC B24-0001 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Law L24-0020, Effective from Aug 21, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010052
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Law L24-0020, Effective from Aug 21, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010052
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
FUNDING NOTE - This law was passed Subject to Appropriations. See Bill 24-275 for funding certification and Bill 24-285 for Subject to Appropriations repealer.
Title
Comprehensive Plan Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Council | Law L24-0020, Effective from Aug 21, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010052 |
2021-07-16 | Council | Act A24-0110 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 006918 |
2021-07-12 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-07-07 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-07-07 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0110 |
2021-07-06 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 20, 2021 |
2021-05-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-05-18 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2021-05-18 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2021-05-04 | Council | First Reading |
2021-05-04 | Council | Amendment (Nadeau) |
2021-05-04 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2021-01-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0001 Published in the DC Register |
2021-01-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-01-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |