DC B23-1002 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 23 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-11 - Act A23-0523 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14442, Expires on Mar 08, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 23 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-11 - Act A23-0523 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14442, Expires on Mar 08, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan Police Department Overtime Spending Accountability Emergency Act of 2020
Title
Metropolitan Police Department Overtime Spending Accountability Emergency Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-17 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-11 | Council | Act A23-0523 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14442, Expires on Mar 08, 2021 |
2020-12-09 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0523, Expires on Mar 08, 2021 |
2020-12-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 8, 2020 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Amendment (Nadeau) |
2020-11-17 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-11-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-11-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |