DC B23-0957 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-13 - Act A23-0457 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13224, Expires on Feb 01, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-13 - Act A23-0457 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13224, Expires on Feb 01, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. NFPHC-2018-156 Modification 1 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and Premium Critical Care Solutions LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Contract No. NFPHC-2018-156 Modification 1 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and Premium Critical Care Solutions LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-13 | Council | Act A23-0457 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13224, Expires on Feb 01, 2021 |
2020-11-04 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0457, Expires on Feb 01, 2021 |
2020-11-03 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-10-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 3, 2020 |
2020-10-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-09-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |