DC B23-0921 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-921 establishes measures to insure a transition plan is developed for timely enrollment and placement in an educational program and it also requires the designation of one employee to serve as the point-of-contact for Students in the Care of the District of Columbia (SCDC). It provides measures to facilitate records transmission among agencies and creates a Uniform Transcript Evaluation Procedure for SCDCs among other things.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Education and Credit Continuity Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-24CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-11-06CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-10-30CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-10-06CouncilReferred to Committee on Education
2020-10-02CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0921 Published in the DC Register
2020-09-22CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback