DC B23-0890 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-890 requires mandatory query of the prescription drug monitoring database by prescribers and dispensers prior to prescribing or dispensing an opioid or benzodiazepine for more than seven consecutive days, and every ninety days thereafter while the course of treatment or therapy continues, or prior to dispensing another refill after ninety days.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Monitoring Program Query Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-28CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-10-09CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-10-05CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-25CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0890 Published in the DC Register
2020-09-22CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2020-09-18CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback