DC B23-0854 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0164, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000738, Expires on Aug 04, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0164, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000738, Expires on Aug 04, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
RPP Voluntary Exclusion Temporary Act of 2020
Title
RPP Voluntary Exclusion Temporary Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Law L23-0164, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000738, Expires on Aug 04, 2021 |
2020-11-13 | Council | Act A23-0461 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13232 |
2020-11-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-11-03 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-02 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0461 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 3, 2020 |
2020-09-22 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-07-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0854 Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-07-23 | Council | First Reading |
2020-07-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |