DC B23-0818 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-818 provides and enrollment preference for a child of a student already attending or selected for admission to a public charter school.
Title
Child Enrollment Preference Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-31 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-07-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0818 Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-07-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0818 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/45296/Introduction/B23-0818-Introduction.pdf |