DC B23-0813 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-13 - Law L23-0141, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13206, Expires on Jun 01, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-13 - Law L23-0141, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13206, Expires on Jun 01, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Investigating Maternal Mortalities Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Investigating Maternal Mortalities Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-13 | Council | Law L23-0141, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13206, Expires on Jun 01, 2021 |
2020-09-03 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-08-21 | Council | Act A23-0394 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9907 |
2020-08-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-08-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0394 |
2020-07-30 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 13, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-07-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0813 Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-07 | Council | First Reading |
2020-07-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-07-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |