DC B23-0784 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-25 - Act A23-0531 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14772
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-25 - Act A23-0531 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14772
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 23-784 orders the closing of a portion of Morton Street, N.W., and the portions of the public alley system adjacent to Square 3039 in Ward 1. It accepts the dedication and designation of 6th Street, N.W., Luray Place, N.W., and an extension of Morton Street, N.W., for public street purposes, and accepts the dedication of land adjacent to Square 3039 for public alley purposes in Ward 1.
Title
Closing of Public Streets and Alleys and Dedication of Land for Public and Alley Purposes Adjacent to Squares 3039, 3040, and 3043, S.O. 17-21093 and S.O. 17-21094 Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-25 | Council | Act A23-0531 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14772 |
2020-12-21 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-17 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0531 |
2020-12-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2020 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-09 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-10-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0784 |
2020-09-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-07-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0784 Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-16 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |