DC B23-0771 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-771 prohibits the use of chemical irritants at First Amendment assemblies.
Title
Internationally Banned Chemical Weapon Prohibition Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-08-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0771 Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2020-06-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0771 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/45092/Introduction/B23-0771-Introduction.pdf |