DC B23-0746 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Act A23-0324 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 6721, Expires on Aug 25, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Act A23-0324 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 6721, Expires on Aug 25, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ghost Guns Prohibition Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Ghost Guns Prohibition Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Council | Act A23-0324 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 6721, Expires on Aug 25, 2020 |
2020-05-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-05-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0324, Expires on Aug 25, 2020 |
2020-05-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 28, 2020 |
2020-05-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-05-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-05-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |