DC B23-0733 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-21 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

COVID-19 Response Supplemental Emergency Amendment Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 Response Supplemental Emergency Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-21CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-04-17CouncilAct A23-0286 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4178, Expires on Jul 09, 2020
2020-04-13CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-04-10CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0286, Expires on Jul 09, 2020
2020-04-10CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 24, 2020
2020-04-07CouncilFinal Reading
2020-04-07CouncilAmendment (Mendelson)
2020-04-06CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback