DC B23-0718 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To address the effects of the coronavirus pandemic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 Response Emergency Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Council - Amendment #1 (Gray) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-07CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-03-20CouncilAct A23-0247 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3093, Expires on Jun 15, 2020
2020-03-18CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-03-17CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0247, Expires on Jun 15, 2020
2020-03-17CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 31, 2020
2020-03-17CouncilFinal Reading
2020-03-17CouncilAmendment #2 (Gray) - Not considered
2020-03-17CouncilAmendment #1 (Gray)
2020-03-17CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback