DC B23-0666 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0581 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001133
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0581 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001133
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-666 requires the Mayor to design and issue motor vehicle identification tags that celebrate the Washington Mystics 2019 Women's National Basketball Championship.
Incorporates provisions from Bill 23-699.
Title
Washington Mystics Motor Vehicle Identification Tags Amendment Act of 2020 (now known as "Specialty License Plate Amendment Act of 2020")
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0581 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001133 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0581 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-10 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-10-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-26 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0666 |
2020-09-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-08-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0666 Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2020-02-18 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |