DC B23-0643 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-643 requires housing providers to provide the rental units of elderly tenants and tenants with a disability with refrigerated air equipment capable of maintaining a room temperature of 78 degrees Fahrenheit or less.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Keeping Cool Elderly Tenants and Tenants with a Disability Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-09-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-11CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-03-20CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-03-13CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-02-28CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-02-07CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0643 Published in the DC Register
2020-02-04CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2020-02-04CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback